Trustees TEES VALLEY WILDLIFE TRUST LTD
Charity number: 511068

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN MICHAEL DEAR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Peter James Kilgour | Trustee | 10 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Solomon | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Hammond | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Anne Johnson | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Siobhan Callaghan | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Henderson | Trustee | 28 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brian John Nicholson | Trustee | 25 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL MCNULTY | Trustee | 08 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
KEITH HISSITT | Trustee |
|
||||||
JULIE CLARE MASON | Trustee |
|
||||||
DR MARK FISHPOOL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN SIMKINS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.