ROCKFIELD PARK COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running and maintaining a Community Centre to provide leisure and learning facilities. The Centre is owned by Monmouthshire County Council and leased to the Charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 October 2024
Total income includes £721 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Monmouthshire
Governance
- 26 October 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Patricia Findlay | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Kingsley Jones | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter David Jefferies | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
HANNAH FRANCES LINEHAM BSC MEDQTS | Trustee | 25 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA MARIE JAMESON BSC BA | Trustee | 25 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/10/2020 | 30/10/2021 | 30/10/2022 | 30/10/2023 | 30/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.75k | £11.19k | £11.70k | £19.46k | £13.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.78k | £12.60k | £10.39k | £22.19k | £10.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.40k | N/A | N/A | £7.25k | £721 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 October 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 October 2023 | 08 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2023 | 08 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 October 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 October 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 October 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF ROCKFIELD ESTATE IN MONMOUTH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CORNWALLIS WAY
MONMOUTH
NP25 5DN
- Phone:
- 01600715075
- Website:
-
rockfieldparkcc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window