BOWLAND PENNINE MOUNTAIN RESCUE TEAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide efficient search and rescue services, primarily but not exclusively on mountains and fells, for the benefit of any person or persons in need of such services and also promote public safety in this subject by whatever charitable means the Executive Committee think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £5,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cumbria
- Lancashire
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 20 February 1981: Standard registration
- BOWLAND-PENNINE MOUNTAIN RESCUE TEAM (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Matthews | Chair | 21 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Graham Tagg | Trustee | 31 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Shanahan | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lottie Robinson | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Gilder | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN HINDLE BEM | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Bond | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JAMES WILLOUGHBY | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID SUART | Trustee | 12 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
CLIVE SHELLEY | Trustee | 01 May 2012 |
|
|||||
CRISPIN MYERSCOUGH | Trustee | 24 April 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84.75k | £60.33k | £248.66k | £76.90k | £296.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.44k | £85.02k | £92.19k | £121.58k | £104.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £11.00k | £5.00k | £5.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08/10/1980 AS AMENDED ON 27/07/1988 AS AMENDED ON 19/04/1995 AS AMENDED ON 17/04/1996 AS AMENDED ON 09/04/1997 AS AMENDED ON 26/04/2006 AS AMENDED ON 16/04/2008 AS AMENDED ON 10/10/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE EFFICIENT MOUNTAIN SEARCH AND RESCUE SERVICES FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY PERSON OR PERSONS IN NEED OF SUCH SERVICES. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT 3
AREA A
CREAMERY INDUSTRIAL ESTATE
KENLIS ROAD
BARNACRE
- Phone:
- 01995604999
- Email:
- secretary@bpmrt.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window