BETHEL PENTECOSTAL CHURCH MANCHESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
.To promote or carry out research, .To provide advice, .To publish or distribute information, .To co-operate with other bodies. .To support, administer or set up other charities, .To raise funds (but not by means of taxable trading), . To borrow money and give security for loan (but only in accordance with the restrictions . To insure the property of the Church against any foreseeable risk
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charitable Activities
- Tameside
Governance
- 31 January 2018: Standard registration
- BETPENT - C.A (Working name)
- BETHEL PENTECOSTAL CHURCH ASHTON U-LYNE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev AIME FREDERIC SAIDI | Chair | 23 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Safi Wa Luitila Bwassaka | Trustee | 14 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bihiza Laurent Rubangiriza | Trustee | 14 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
MADELEINE RUSIMBI ASHA | Trustee | 23 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHANTAL JOSEPHINE DOLPHINE | Trustee | 23 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.18k | £24.59k | £24.59k | £24.68k | £25.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.70k | £23.59k | £23.59k | £15.78k | £23.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 December 2024 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2024 | 261 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 OCT 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: (A)TO REACH PEOPLE, LEADING THEM TO A PERSONAL FAITH IN JESUS CHRIST AS SAVIOUR AND LORD (JOHN 3:16),TO SEE INDIVIDUALS HEAL EMOTIONALLY AS THEY GROW IN FAITH TOWARD GOD AND IN THE KNOWLEDGE OF HIS WORD, TO EQUIP CHRISTIANS FOR WORKS OF SERVICE, ENCOURAGING SPIRITUAL GROWTH AND HELPING THEM TO RECOGNIZE AND DEVELOP THEIR GOD-GIVEN GIFTS THROUGH THE TEACHING OF THE BIBLE, THE MINISTRY OF THE HOLY SPIRIT, AND WORSHIP (2 TIMOTHY 3:16-17, I CORINTHIANS 12:4-10, EPHESIANS 4:12-13, JOHN 4:24), TO SEND TRAINED AND WILLING CHRISTIANS OUT INTO THE WORLD TO PROMOTE EVANGELISM AND MISSIONARY WORK IN ALL PLACES, AND TO ESTABLISH AND ORGANIZE CHURCHES AND FOSTER THEIR DEVELOPMENT TO FURTHER THE KINGDOM OF GOD (MARK 16:15). (B)TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM THE TIME THINK FIT; AND (C)TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 DERWENT TERRACE
STALYBRIDGE
Cheshire
SK15 1EP
- Phone:
- 07464007496
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window