Accounts and annual returns PRESENCE GOSPEL MINISTRY

Charity number: 1176325
Charity reporting is overdue by 1382 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 286 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 286 days
Annual return 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 652 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 652 days
Annual return 30 September 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1017 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1017 days
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1382 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1382 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 10 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 10 March 2020 On Time Download Open in new window