Financial history Rhino Rescue UK Ltd

Charity number: 1178155
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £17.60k £25.38k £28.12k £9.88k £5.88k
Total expenditure £19.86k £23.91k £15.01k £16.40k £15.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A