Trustees JAIN SAMAJ, MANCHESTER
Charity number: 511076

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BHOGILAL SHAH | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ansuya Shah | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shailesh Mehta | Trustee | 12 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kiran Mehta | Trustee | 12 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jyotsna Patel RELIGOUS | Trustee | 15 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Piyush G Mehta | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mehul Mehta JSECRETRAY | Trustee | 11 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Falguni Mehta TREASURER | Trustee | 11 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hiren VORA PRESIDENT | Trustee | 21 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nehal Mahendra Mehta SECRATARY | Trustee | 22 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nitesh Shah VPRESIDENT | Trustee | 22 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
SAROJ PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.