BI PRIDE UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bi Pride UK creates spaces for people who are attracted to more than one gender to celebrate their identities and be part of a welcoming community. We do this through working with local Prides to improve bi visibility and bi inclusion in their events, running our own annual Bi Pride event, and hosting virtual spaces and conversations for bi people to participate in.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
140 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 February 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Avi Baylas | Chair | 05 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Abraham Glover | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tash Payne | Trustee | 16 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anuli Changa | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kirsten Barnett | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Lipley | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Shereen Jivraj | Trustee | 21 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shannon Gossage | Trustee | 31 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ella Rachel Pooley | Trustee | 31 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert John Davey | Trustee | 17 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anna Bond | Trustee | 28 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.59k | £16.39k | £99.68k | £23.32k | £35.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.14k | £6.36k | £16.84k | £66.50k | £31.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 January 2021 | 91 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 January 2021 | 91 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Feb 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND THOSE BELONGING TO ONE OR MORE MINORITY IDENTITY. PARTICULAR FOCUS IS ON THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION AGAINST PEOPLE SELF-IDENTIFYING AS OR ASSUMED TO BE ATTRACTED TO MORE THAN ONE GENDER (INCLUDING BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BISEXUAL/ROMANTIC, PANSEXUAL/ROMANTIC, AND POLYSEXUAL/ROMANTIC PEOPLE) BY: - RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF ISSUES AND DIFFICULTIES FACED BY PEOPLE WHO EXPERIENCE ATTRACTION TO MORE THAN ONE GENDER; - CELEBRATING, RESPECTING AND HIGHLIGHTING THE DIVERSITY OF COMMUNITIES OF PEOPLE WHO EXPERIENCE ATTRACTION TO MORE THAN ONE GENDER; - STAGING A PERIODIC MULTISEXUAL (‘BI PRIDE’ FESTIVAL, AND SMALLER EVENTS THROUGHOUT THE YEAR; AND - SUCH OTHER OBJECTS AS ARE CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOUSMANS BOOKSHOP LTD
5 CALEDONIAN ROAD
LONDON
N1 9DX
- Phone:
- 07410585810
- Email:
- web.admin@biprideuk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window