THE ELDON FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Give grants and loans to registered charities in the UK working to promote Christian education specially in accordance with the teachings of St Josemaria Escriva, the founder of Opus Dei.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 December 2017: CIO registration
- EF (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SPIRO YOUAKIM | Chair | 04 October 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
JACK VALERO | Trustee | 04 October 2017 |
|
|||||||||
Xavier Bosch | Trustee | 04 October 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.50k | £10.50k | £11.65k | £38.87k | £116.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £10.07k | £13.08k | £35.90k | £46.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 29 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 29 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Dec 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, ESPECIALLY OF THE YOUNG AND DISADVANTAGED, BY THE PROVISION OF WELL-ROUNDED EDUCATION TO INCLUDE PHYSICAL, MORAL, INTELLECTUAL, SPIRITUAL AND EMOTIONAL DEVELOPMENT, INSPIRED PARTICULARLY BY THE TEACHINGS OF ST JOSEMARÍA ESCRIVÁ, FOUNDER OF OPUS DEI, INCLUDING, BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO, BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO ORGANISATIONS WHICH PROMOTE THE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GRANDPONT HOUSE
ABINGDON ROAD
OXFORD
OX1 4LD
- Phone:
- 07950020117
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window