TRINITY ROAD CHAPEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide a place of worship. Publicise the activities and beliefs of the Church in surrounding area. Support church members who are in full time Christian service and support organisations with similar objectives by way of donations. We achieve these objectives by Christian Services open to the public at the Church Premises and midweek meetings and encourage members to attend .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 09 February 2018: CIO registration
- 25 August 2020: Funds received from 239650 LAND HELD FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN CONNEXION WIT...
- 25 August 2020: Funds received from 239651-1 TRINITY ROAD CHAPEL - MANSE FOR MINISTER
- 25 August 2020: Funds received from 239651-2 TRINITY ROAD CHAPEL - LAND HELD IN CONNEXION THERE...
- 25 August 2020: Funds received from 239651 TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNEXION WITH TRINITY ROAD...
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STUART WILLIAM DAVIS | Chair | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
JAMES MILDRED | Trustee | 02 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Kinnaird | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL JOHN WARNER | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE MMBAGO | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|||||
DAVID RICHARD BLAKE | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £518.00k | £192.68k | £271.14k | £723.71k | £156.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £371.23k | £252.03k | £325.23k | £227.37k | £249.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £177.47k | N/A | N/A | £133.93k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £60.00k | N/A | N/A | £58.96k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £10 | N/A | N/A | £142 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £280.52k | N/A | N/A | £530.68k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £371.23k | N/A | N/A | £226.56k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | £808 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £3.22k | N/A | N/A | £1.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £68.66k | N/A | N/A | £63.82k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 09 Feb 2018 as amended on 08 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH ARE: 1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN WANDSWORTH COMMON AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD; AND 2. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF THE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH IN GENERAL MEETING, PUT INTO PRACTICE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND SICKNESS; THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; AND THE PROVISION OF COMMUNITY FACILITIES;
Contact information
- Address:
-
77 THOMAS BAINES ROAD
LONDON
SW11 2HH
- Phone:
- 02073502579
- Email:
- admin@trinityroadchapel.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window