THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY HANWELL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting in the Parish the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £8,858 from 2 government grant(s)
People

14 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Ealing
Governance
- 05 December 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW JOHN DAND | Chair | 07 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Margaret Schroeder | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Sarah Bush | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Paula Milazzo Chaves Fernandes | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Edna Bevan Mrs | Trustee | 14 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Camille Adams | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Joseph Hennessy | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
HELEN VIRGINIA WHITE | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Cosstick | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Joseph Phelan | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Davies | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Bevan | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Edsel Edison Jodhan | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Helen Mary Cosstick | Trustee | 01 June 2009 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £164.94k | £146.87k | £154.35k | £152.65k | £183.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £155.29k | £158.34k | £140.47k | £142.68k | £190.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.50k | £8.86k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
91 CHURCH ROAD
Hanwell
LONDON
W7 3BJ
- Phone:
- 02085676185
- Email:
- andrew@stmaryshanwell.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window