FINISH LINE FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1)Provision of grants to runners and/or their families affected by serious injury, disability or death whilst participating in the sport of running. 2)Promoting running and other sports at amateur level in Southend-on-Sea and surrounding areas by organising running events and providing equipment and sponsorship to clubs in Southend-on-Sea and the surrounding areas to promote health and wellbeing
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Essex
- Southend-on-sea
Governance
- 12 July 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEITH PASSINGHAM | Chair | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Vikki Kenney | Trustee | 11 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dean Robert Hartman | Trustee | 11 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stu Robb | Trustee | 11 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elisha Letley | Trustee | 25 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anna Prowse | Trustee | 18 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARK BENHAM | Trustee | 10 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
LLOYD RICHARDSON | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA JANE BENHAM | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.49k | £15.18k | £17.03k | £20.27k | £29.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.48k | £12.50k | £17.50k | £22.12k | £19.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 10 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 JAN 2017 AS AMENDED ON 30 JUN 2018 as amended on 15 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN EAST ESSEX IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: · THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO RUNNERS AND/OR THEIR FAMILIES WHO HAVE BEEN AFFECTED BY SERIOUS INJURY, DISABILITY OR DEATH WHILST PARTICIPATING IN THE SPORT OF RUNNING. · PROMOTING RUNNING AND OTHER SPORTS AT AN AMATEUR LEVEL IN SOUTHEND-ON-SEA AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY ORGANISING RUNNING EVENTS AND PROVIDING EQUIPMENT AND SPONSORSHIP TO CLUBS IN SOUTHEND-ON-SEA AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS TO PROMOTE HEALTH AND WELLBEING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 TRINITY CLOSE
RAYLEIGH
SS6 8QE
- Phone:
- 07970942905
- Email:
- admin@finishlinefund.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window