Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DAMASCUS

Charity number: 1175551
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £517.93k £514.07k £238.38k £263.76k £253.59k
Total expenditure £604.28k £577.13k £209.99k £201.80k £206.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £17.76k £149.01k £9.95k £12.56k £3.50k
Income - Donations and legacies £448.49k £472.83k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £27.48k £10.96k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £14.29k £9.56k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £14.29k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £15.04k £13.95k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £12.64k £6.77k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £597.42k £574.23k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £6.86k £764 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £1.73k £995 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £2.73k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £2.13k N/A N/A N/A