THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DAMASCUS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups Taking of religious assemblies in schools. The provision of a youth club with a Christian ethos. Promotion of Christianity through the staging of eve
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £3,497 from 3 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 03 November 2017: Standard registration
- DAMASCUS PARISH (Working name)
- DAMASCUS PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev HELEN KENDRICK | Chair | 01 July 2017 |
|
|||||||
Caroline Miller | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Anthony Sloggett | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Elaine Maxwell | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Murray | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Alison Budd | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Philip Sutton | Trustee | 08 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||
VALERIE CROSS | Trustee | 13 September 2017 |
|
|||||||
NICOLA TURNER | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|||||||
ALEXANDRA LANDSBERT | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Professor DAVID KING | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||
HH ANTHONY KING | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £517.93k | £514.07k | £238.38k | £263.76k | £253.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £604.28k | £577.13k | £209.99k | £201.80k | £206.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £17.76k | £149.01k | £9.95k | £12.56k | £3.50k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £448.49k | £472.83k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £27.48k | £10.96k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £14.29k | £9.56k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £14.29k | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £15.04k | £13.95k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £12.64k | £6.77k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £597.42k | £574.23k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £6.86k | £764 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £1.73k | £995 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £2.73k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £2.13k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH, PASTORAL, EVANGELISTIC, SOCIAL AND ECUMENICAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Damascus Parish Office @ All Saints Church
The Green
Sutton Courtenay
ABINGDON
Oxfordshire
OX14 4AE
- Phone:
- 01235847179
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
damascusparish.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window