AL - AMAANAH FOUNDATION (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH OF PEOPLE LIVING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN VILLAGES OF SYLHET, BANGLADESH BY THE PROVISION OF AN AMBULANCE SERVICE. 2) THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF WAR OR NATURAL DISASTER, TROUBLE, OR CATASTROPHE IN PARTICULAR BY THE SUPPLY OF GOODS AND SERVICES TO SUCH PERSONS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 12 April 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHAMSU MIAH | Chair | 12 April 2018 |
|
|||||
KAWSOR AHMED | Trustee | 12 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
SHANUR MOHAMMAD ALI | Trustee | 12 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MUHAMMAD HAFIZUR RAHMAN | Trustee | 12 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MIZAN ALI | Trustee | 12 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
AMIRUL ISLAM | Trustee | 12 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ABDUL SALIM | Trustee | 12 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MUHAMMAD NAZRUL ISLAM | Trustee | 12 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.83k | £6.29k | £9.93k | £18.59k | £12.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.13k | £6.44k | £6.55k | £23.93k | £11.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 20 February 2024 | 173 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 20 February 2024 | 173 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
1) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH OF PEOPLE LIVING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN VILLAGES OF SYLHET, BANGLADESH BY THE PROVISION OF AN AMBULANCE SERVICE. 2) THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF WAR OR NATURAL DISASTER, TROUBLE, OR CATASTROPHE IN PARTICULAR BY THE SUPPLY OF GOODS AND SERVICES TO SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
548A Coventry Road
Small Heath
B10 0UN
- Phone:
- 07703357377
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window