Trustees NEWPORT PAGNELL BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1175783

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philippa Lei | Chair | 06 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Grace Miriam Inwood | Trustee | 06 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN ROBERT PAUL DUNN | Trustee | 06 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Chrisann Meij | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Mary Thompson | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alex Millington | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Peter Young | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Mulwa | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Beaney | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Wood | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.