GERANIUM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Geranium Trust offers friendship & support to less fortunate & disadvantaged members of society including the elderly, people with Special Educational Needs & those living with loneliness & feeling issolated. We organise regular tea parties, roast dinners, gardening groups, nature walks and wildlife studies. We also run an LGBT plus support group with monthly coffee mornings & Sunday roast dinners
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dorset
- Somerset
Governance
- 19 January 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TERENCE JOHN PALFREY | Chair | 11 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Kemp | Trustee | 12 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Angie Beeston | Trustee | 22 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANN TATE | Trustee | 11 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
NEIL JONES | Trustee | 11 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.51k | £1.86k | £4.87k | £14.24k | £5.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.21k | £619 | £2.55k | £5.09k | £3.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 09 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 09 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 09 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 09 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 16 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 16 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
COURT HOUSE
COURT LANE
STOFORD
YEOVIL
BA22 9UA
- Phone:
- 01935429096
- Email:
- GeraniumTrust@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window