Financial history BLAENAU RECREATION ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 511095
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £0 £610 £6.62k £0 £0
Total expenditure £1.80k £488 £488 £609 £638
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A