MCGINLEY FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of health and the relief of those in need b reason of 11 health and disability by assisting as trustees see fit any charity whose aims include the protection or promotion of health. Advancement of education for public benefit of people under age of 25 ( but not limited to) by awarding scholarships , maintenance allowances or grants to individuals. Prevention and relief of poverty
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 February 2018: Standard registration
- MCGINLEY CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SINEAD ROCHFORD | Chair | 20 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Eoin Christopher McGinley | Trustee | 31 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
SEAMUS MCGINLEY | Trustee | 15 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £2.50k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £2.17k | £80 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 181 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 181 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 547 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 547 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 912 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 912 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2021 | 342 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ORGANISATION (OBJECTS) ARE: 1.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH AND DISABILITY, BY ASSISTING AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT ANY CHARITY WHOSE AIMS INCLUDE THE PROTECTION OR PROMOTION OF HEALTH (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO CHARITIES WHICH PROVIDE TREATMENT AND CARE TO PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OR WHICH CONDUCT RESEARCH OR PROVIDE INFORMATION AND IMPROVE PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING); 1.1.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) BY: (A) AWARDING SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS; AND (B) ASSISTING IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT ANY CHARITY WHOSE AIMS INCLUDE ADVANCING EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS BY DEVELOPING THEIR MENTAL, PHYSICAL OR MORAL CAPABILITIES; 1.1.3 THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING GRANTS AND ITEMS TO: (A) INDIVIDUALS IN NEED; AND (B) CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD WHICH RELIEVE POVERTY (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO CHARITIES WHICH PROVIDE OR ASSIST THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AND HEALTHCARE OR OTHER SUPPORT); 1.1.4 THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH OTHER OBJECTS OR PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Phoenix House
Oxford Road
GERRARDS CROSS
Buckinghamshire
SL9 7AP
- Phone:
- 07973 737 355
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window