FRIENDS OF ST ANDREW'S SCHOOL (PANGBOURNE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends of St Andrews (Pangbourne) works by encouraging members of the school community to come together and support the various events organised by the committee throughout the year, such as Bonfire night, the Christmas Fayre, FOSA Funday and the Quiz night. Funds generated by these events are then used to purchase "luxury" goods that enhance the children's experience at school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- West Berkshire
- South Africa
- Uganda
Governance
- 08 November 2017: Standard registration
- FOSA (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Karen Montagu-Williams | Chair | 20 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Louise Rodgers | Trustee | 20 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Westropp | Trustee | 20 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rhian Ogden-Slee | Trustee | 20 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Annabel Kate Tregoning | Trustee | 20 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Heather Cowan | Trustee | 20 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Charlotte Squires | Trustee | 20 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Charlotte Clegg | Trustee | 20 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Jane Gearing | Trustee | 26 January 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.74k | £71.00k | £14.03k | £46.73k | £33.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.51k | £68.56k | £14.96k | £44.85k | £26.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 27 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 JUN 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. ANDREWS SCHOOL
BUCKHOLD
PANGBOURNE
READING
RG8 8QA
- Phone:
- 01189744276
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window