Financial history BORRAS PARK FULL DAY CARE PROVISION

Charity Number: 1179617
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £226.80k £177.25k £200.14k £318.60k £294.82k
Total expenditure £147.72k £147.63k £196.76k £534.98k £317.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £2.45k N/A £20.00k £1.15k