PROMISING FUTURES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing small grants to individuals up to the age of 18 years who live, work or go to school on Castle Vale. These grants are to support in hardship or to widen horizons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 19 October 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TREVOR EVANS | Chair | 19 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
SEAN JORDAN | Trustee | 19 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
JULIE EDWARDS | Trustee | 19 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
TAYLOR BILLINGS | Trustee | 19 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.80k | £8.22k | £286 | £123 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £593 | £6.10k | £4.01k | £2.12k | £764 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 May 2024 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 May 2024 | 99 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 18 LIVING, WORKING OR GOING TO SCHOOL IN CASTLE VALE, WHO SUFFER FROM FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, TO SUPPORT THEIR DEVELOPMENT AND ASPIRATIONS GIVE THEM EVERY CHANCE TO SUCCEED IN THE FUTURE, THROUGH CONTRIBUTIONS TOWARDS THE LIKES OF EQUIPMENT, CLOTHING, TRIPS AND VISITS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DEEM APPROPRIATE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GREENWOOD ACADEMY
220 FARNBOROUGH ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
B35 7NL
- Phone:
- 01214646101
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window