THE MEDIATORS, ASH GREEN

Charity number: 511100
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO Support Disabled clients within Derbyshire through acquisition and deployment of resources--people,equipment,facilities,transport

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015

Total income: £4,500
Total expenditure: £5,669

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 February 1981: Standard registration
  • 18 August 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • WHITTINGTON HALL MEDIATORS (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £6.27k £2.21k £6.48k £6.69k £4.50k
Total expenditure £5.97k £1.63k £8.48k £6.09k £5.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2015 02 April 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 28 May 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 10 June 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required