PHOENIX REHOMING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dog rescue and rehoming.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 October 2017: Standard registration
- SPANIEL PHOENIX REHOMING (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lisa McKie | Trustee | 20 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Close | Trustee | 14 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kerrie-Marie Collimore | Trustee | 17 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
CARLA KILGALLON | Trustee | 08 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.69k | £259.83k | £190.08k | £109.35k | £109.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.73k | £228.14k | £172.28k | £72.90k | £63.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25 OCT 2017 AS AMENDED ON 13 MAR 2018 as amended on 13 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF DOGS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 OAKSHOTT DRIVE
HAVANT
PO9 5SN
- Phone:
- 02393552639
- Email:
- phoenixrehoming@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window