Accounts and annual returns TWISTERS SOUTH WALES REBOUND TRAMPOLINE CLUB

Charity number: 1175711
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 315 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 315 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2021 16 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 16 June 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2020 03 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 03 June 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2019 04 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 05 June 2020 On Time