TWISTERS SOUTH WALES REBOUND TRAMPOLINE CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of recreational and competitive trampoline classes to children and adults of all ages and abilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
Total income includes £4,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Cardiff
- Merthyr Tydfil
Governance
- 13 November 2017: CIO registration
- 12 March 2019: Funds received from 1117704 REBOUNDERS SPECIAL NEEDS TRAMPOLINE CLUB
- 23 April 2025: Funds transferred to
- 23 April 2025: Removed (Removed by application)
- REBOUNDERS ACCESSIBLE TRAMPOLINING (Previous name)
- REBOUNDERS SPECIAL NEEDS TRAMPOLINING (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.11k | £154.58k | £167.44k | £108.35k | £134.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £105.81k | £147.71k | £155.77k | £135.42k | £136.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £25.00k | £20.00k | £4.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 311 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 311 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 04 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 05 June 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 13 NOV 2017 AS AMENDED ON 11 JUL 2018 AMENDED ON 24 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
To promote and preserve good health through community participation in healthy recreation, in particular by the provision of facilities for trampolining for children and adults.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window