Financial history THE GREY DOG TRUST

Charity number: 1176205
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £33.80k £12.66k £5.30k £5.77k £3.22k
Total expenditure £25.19k £3.57k £4.86k £6.56k £6.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A