URSULINE PREPARATORY SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hold fundraising activities within the school grounds that also help foster the relationships between the children, parents and staff such as school discos, quiz nights, movie nights, bingo, fairs, and run a weekly french cafe and half termly second hand uniform stalls. Additionally we host a biannual charity ball for parents staff and alumni of the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 01 December 2017: Standard registration
- 22 October 2024: Removed (Removed by application)
- UPSPA (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.02k | £32.42k | £19.44k | £60.11k | £54.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.72k | £50.32k | £9.91k | £43.19k | £81.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 September 2022 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 September 2022 | 430 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 03 September 2022 | 430 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 03 September 2022 | 795 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 03 September 2022 | 795 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 1) EXTENDING AND FOSTERING DEEPER RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE PUPILS, STAFF, PARENTS, ALUMNI AND OTHER FRIENDS OF THE SCHOOL; BUILDING THE SPIRITUAL AND SOCIAL DEVELOPMENT OF THE SCHOOL COMMUNITY; AND PROVIDING A FORUM TO DISCUSS TOPICS OF GENERAL INTEREST. 2) RUNNING ACTIVITIES IN SUPPORT OF THE SCHOOL, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND ENJOYMENT OF THE SCHOOL COMMUNITY AND TO ASSIST THE SCHOOL IN WHATEVER WAY THE PARENTS, THE SCHOOL AND THE HEAD TEACHER TOGETHER DEEM APPROPRIATE. 3) FUND-RAISING ON BEHALF OF THE SCHOOL TO PROVIDE ENHANCED FACILITIES, RESOURCES, AND EQUIPMENT TO BENEFIT THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL. 4) MAKING DONATIONS OR PROVIDE GRANTS FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES TO OTHER REGISTERED CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS CHOSEN FROM TIME TO TIME BY THE ASSOCIATION.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window