Accounts and annual returns CHILD HEALTH AFRICA

Charity number: 1175252
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 20 June 2024 09 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 20 June 2023 26 June 2024 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 20 June 2022 10 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 20 June 2021 27 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 20 June 2020 27 July 2021 98 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 June 2020 Not Required