Financial history CHILD HEALTH AFRICA

Charity number: 1175252
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 20/06/2020 20/06/2021 20/06/2022 20/06/2023 20/06/2024
Total gross income £13.32k £1.76k £3.55k £3.84k £10.48k
Total expenditure £2.40k £14.85k £9.96k £21.40k £17.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A