ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF KING EDWARD VI CAMP HILL SCHOOL FOR BOYS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDING FOR THE WELFARE AND EDUCATIONAL EXTRAS FOR A BOYS' SECONDARY SCHOOL
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 27 February 1981: Standard registration
- AFS (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Safeena Begum Rahman | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Dainty | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.54k | £1.53k | £1.19k | £9.56k | £6.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.41k | £5.45k | £4.86k | £12.22k | £5.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 FEBRUARY 1975 AS AMENDED 23 JANUARY 1981 AND 7 SEPTEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; AND 2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Camp Hill School For Boys
Vicarage Road
Kings Heath
BIRMINGHAM
B14 7QJ
- Phone:
- 01214443188
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window