THORPE LEA PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1175183
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Thorpe Lea Primary School PTA run various events throughout the academic year to help raise funds for the school and its pupils. A wide variety of events will run throughout the year, with suggestions as to what events should run being contributed by the community of Thorpe Lea Primary School

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £9,454
Total expenditure: £9,270

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 October 2017: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Adam Collin Trustee 04 February 2022
None on record
Anna Scally Trustee 12 October 2017
None on record
DONNA ROCKETT Trustee 12 October 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £13.76k £6.21k £6.73k £7.49k £9.45k
Total expenditure £9.42k £4.50k £2.64k £14.52k £9.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 19 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 19 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 06 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Thorpe Lea Primary School
Huntingfield Way
Egham
TW20 8DY
Phone:
01784456398