Accounts and annual returns QUICK START HOCKEY

Charity number: 1176770
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 25 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 25 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2023 19 February 2025 204 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 19 February 2025 204 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 19 February 2025 570 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 19 February 2025 570 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 30 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 19 August 2021 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 19 August 2021 20 days late Download Open in new window