IL CUORE ALTROVE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Il Cuore Altrove concentrates our work in the three areas that are crucial to building a brighter future - children, the environment and research/education. We select a project from each area using defined criteria, then support it until our work delivers measurable impact. We focus on organisations that use innovation and landmark thinking to deliver measurable effectiveness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2018
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Italy
- Nepal
- Netherlands
- Niger
- Senegal
- United States
- Yemen
Governance
- 10 April 2018: CIO registration
- ICA (Working name)
- ICA FOUNDATION (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTONELLO CUOMO | Chair | 10 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROSSANA ALVARO | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID PALUMBO | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 236 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 236 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 602 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 602 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 967 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 967 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1332 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1332 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1697 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1697 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
(A) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF CHILD POVERTY ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ASSISTING CHILDREN LIVING IN AREAS OF ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION OR AFFECTED BY WAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND SUPPORT DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR STANDARD OF LIVING AND, IN THE LONG TERM, HELP THEM BECOME SELF-SUFFICIENT; (B) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY FUNDING RESEARCH PROJECTS INTO CURES AND TREATMENTS FOR PARTICULAR DISEASES; AND (D) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER PURPOSES BEING EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 34
Melrose Apartments
6 Winchester Road
LONDON
NW3 3NT
- Phone:
- +447816666394
- Email:
- info@icafoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window