THE COMFREY PROJECT CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide facilities and services for the recreation or other leisure-time occupation of the general public, in particular, but not exclusively, for people who are refugees and seeking asylum, in the north of England, with the object of improving their conditions of life and general well-being, primarily through the provision of horticultural and nature based activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £79,018 from 7 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 18 October 2017: CIO registration
- 29 November 2018: Funds received from 1093365 THE COMFREY PROJECT
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr PENELOPE JANE SCHOFIELD | Chair | 18 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Shoesmith | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Mustafa Ustuner | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tedros Gebregiyorgis | Trustee | 18 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Felour Moghadamy | Trustee | 02 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Melisa Maida | Trustee | 20 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin George Douglas | Trustee | 16 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sally Anne Young | Trustee | 17 February 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £144.01k | £169.26k | £187.00k | £284.86k | £161.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £117.05k | £153.59k | £197.00k | £258.21k | £246.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £32.85k | N/A | £22.00k | £28.82k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £23.35k | £35.30k | £70.00k | £44.87k | £79.02k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 18 OCT 2017 AMENDED ON 15 FEB 2024 as amended on 15 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PROVIDE FACILITIES AND SERVICES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR PEOPLE WHO ARE REFUGEES AND SEEKING ASYLUM, IN THE NORTH OF ENGLAND, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND GENERAL WELL-BEING, PRIMARILY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF HORTICULTURAL AND NATURE BASED ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Windmill Hill Centre
Chester Place
GATESHEAD
NE8 1QB
- Phone:
- 01914477801
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window