Financial history FAITH IN CHRIST CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1176833
Charity reporting is up to date (34 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £11.38k £5.60k £7.59k £10.87k £12.13k
Total expenditure £8.64k £8.45k £8.06k £11.15k £10.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A