MAGIC CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a dedicated youth venue in Claremont, Blackpool. Providing youth work and associated activities to local young people aged 8-16. Increasing available opportunities and supporting young people thrive.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £53,417 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Blackpool
Governance
- 03 May 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LYNN SUZANNE WILLIAMS LLB | Chair | 03 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Michelle Walker | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Dunstan | Trustee | 15 November 2018 |
|
|||||
MARK IAN COBURN | Trustee | 23 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
BRETT HOGARTH | Trustee | 03 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL DAVID ROBERTS-HODGSON | Trustee | 03 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
AVIEL SARAFINA LOWNDES | Trustee | 03 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £141.11k | £222.25k | £114.06k | £219.89k | £242.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £127.44k | £129.88k | £158.44k | £176.95k | £246.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £30.26k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.66k | £4.37k | £16.65k | £33.02k | £53.42k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 03 May 2018
Charitable objects
1. TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE FROM THE AGES OF 8-16 LIVING IN CLAREMONT, BLACKPOOL BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION 2. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o 84 Egerton Road
BLACKPOOL
FY1 2NN
- Phone:
- 07721074132
- Email:
- info@magicclub.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window