FASD AWARENESS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our main aim is to support the prevention of alcohol exposed pregnancies and to improve the quality of life for those living with Foetal Alcohol Spectrum Disorders (FASD) and their parents and carers. Our vision is to be a strong and effective voice for individuals and families living with FASD, while supporting initiatives across the UK to promote prevention, diagnosis, intervention & management.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 01 February 2018: CIO registration
- FASD AWARENESS (Working name)
- FASD AWARENESS SOUTH EAST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peggy Murphy | Chair | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Armstrong | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andy Nichols | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Cartwright Mrs | Trustee | 29 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH MATTHEWS | Trustee | 30 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ANTHONY ALLEN | Trustee | 05 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr ADESOJI ADEGOKE ABIONA | Trustee | 05 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2020 | 04/04/2021 | 04/04/2022 | 04/04/2023 | 04/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.64k | £51.18k | £47.52k | £69.83k | £132.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.58k | £47.92k | £49.50k | £45.82k | £107.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Feb 2018 as amended on 12 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUFFERERS OF FOETAL ALCOHOL SPECTRUM DISORDER (FASD) AND THOSE WHOSE LIVES ARE AFFECTED BY THAT CONDITION WHO LIVE OR WORK IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT OR NEIGHBOURING AREAS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO FOETAL ALCOHOL SPECTRUM DISORDER (FASD) INCLUDING THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL ASPECTS OF FASD AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS. THE AREA OF BENEFIT IS THE SOUTH EAST OF ENGLAND, COUNTY OF KENT AND MEDWAY UNITARY AUTHORITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1b William Street
Rainham
GILLINGHAM
KENT
UK
- Phone:
- 01634566323
- Email:
- info@fasdawareness.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window