LIFE PROJECT FOR YOUTH, ENGLAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Life Project 4 Youth help young adults from socially and economically deprived backgrounds across the world to become productive and self-sufficient members of society by providing financial support for basic education, vocational training, basic essential needs and advice and support on health and social issues.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Bangladesh
- Belgium
- Burma
- Egypt
- France
- India
- Indonesia
- Lebanon
- Luxembourg
- Nepal
- Philippines
- Sri Lanka
- United States
Governance
- 19 March 2018: CIO registration
- LP4Y ENGLAND (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dorothee Charlotte Perrine Alexandra Marie Rambourg | Chair | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jean-Baptiste Decaix | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Edouard Amaury Georges Andre Marie Doutriaux | Trustee | 21 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Maude Wehry | Trustee | 25 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £135.22k | £131.07k | £143.86k | £115.35k | £166.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £128.83k | £53.15k | £243.50k | £149.89k | £109.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG ADULTS FROM SOCIALLY AND/OR ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED BACKGROUNDS ACROSS THE WORLD TO BECOME PRODUCTIVE AND SELF-SUFFICIENT MEMBERS OF SOCIETY BY:- A. PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT FOR BASIC EDUCATION, VOCATIONAL TRAINING AND ADVICE AND SUPPORT ON HEALTH AND SOCIAL ISSUES; B. RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH YOUNG ADULTS BY ENGAGING WITH THE PUBLIC IN A RANGE OF FORUMS (INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, UNIVERSITY CAMPUSES, THE OFFICES OF LARGE ORGANISATIONS AND SOCIAL MEDIA) WITH A VIEW TO ENCOURAGING MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC TO PROVIDE SUPPORT TO SUCH YOUNG ADULTS; AND C. EQUIPPING MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC TO PROVIDE SUPPORT TO SUCH YOUNG ADULTS BY HELPING PROSPECTIVE VOLUNTEERS TO SOURCE TRAINING IN LANGUAGE SKILLS, COMPUTER SKILLS AND OTHER SKILLS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 18
Kensington Mansions
Trebovir Road
LONDON
SW5 9TF
- Phone:
- 07824718888
- Email:
- contact@lp4y.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window