WARD'S CHARITY OR CHURCH LANDS

Charity number: 1176520
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Make grants to St Mary the Virgin, Sawston PCC for the work of the Church in Sawston

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £54,361
Total expenditure: £108,033

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 January 2018: CIO registration
  • 27 July 2019: Funds received from 231091 WARD'S CHARITY OR CHURCH LANDS
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROGER MANSFIELD Chair 19 May 2010
None on record
Dr Corinne Frances Roughley Trustee 28 April 2023
ELIZABETH WAKELIN FOR VICAR
Received: On time
Rev Kathryn Joy Waite Trustee 22 June 2021
FRIENDS OF ST. MARYS CHURCH, SAWSTON
Received: On time
ELIZABETH WAKELIN FOR VICAR
Received: On time
THE BUSH AND BENNETT CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN DAVID CROMPTON Trustee 19 May 2017
TRINITY LABAN CONSERVATOIRE OF MUSIC AND DANCE
Received: On time
ROBERT GEOFFREY RICHMOND Trustee 22 October 2013
None on record
MARY CHRISTINE MILES DICKEN Trustee 22 October 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.29k £574 £51.82k £5.41k £54.36k
Total expenditure £9.25k £4.24k £24.54k £41.59k £108.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
23 PRINCESS DRIVE
SAWSTON
CAMBRIDGE
CB22 3DL
Phone:
01223833761
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available