THEATRE UNCUT PRODUCTIONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Theatre Uncut Productions commissions and produces socially conscious new writing for theatre. The charity is dedicated to making high quality theatrical work as accessible as possible for audiences and participants across the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 January 2018: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Grace | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Palmyra Walwin Findlay | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Evatt Walton | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Siobhan Woodrow | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA KENNEDY | Trustee | 24 February 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.55k | £42.27k | £52.12k | £11.46k | £1.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.67k | £25.77k | £38.01k | £31.57k | £3.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 July 2021 | 170 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 DEC 1899 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: TO ADVANCE THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH HIGH QUALITY THEATRICAL PRODUCTIONS AND PARTICIPATORY PROGRAMMES WHICH EXPLORE SOCIAL ISSUES TO FACILITATE PUBLIC DISCUSSION AND NURTURING CREATIVE VOICES FROM A WIDE RANGE OF BACKGROUNDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Knowle Ground
Summerhill Lane
West Compton
Shepton Mallet
BA4 4PD
- Phone:
- 07841904757
- Email:
- getinvolved@theatreuncut.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window