BEVAN LODGE COMMUNITY PRE SCHOOL CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bevan Lodge is an independent, non-profit making, community pre-school CIO. Located at 67 Albert Road in Farnborough, we have provided childcare for over 30 years and have a highly experienced team of childcare professionals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £126,975 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
Governance
- 15 November 2017: CIO registration
- BEVAN LODGE COMMUNITY PRESCHOOL CIO (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kathryn Davies | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chelsea Green | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Pearcey | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Harriett Cannom | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robin Fell | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Smith | Trustee | 22 August 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120.49k | £129.18k | £133.63k | £149.82k | £160.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.05k | £118.76k | £128.17k | £134.51k | £136.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £107.22k | £400 | £800 | £112.86k | £126.98k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 21 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 15 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BY; PROMOTING THEIR CARE AND SAFETY; PROMOTING THEIR EDUCATION AND PROMOTING PARENTAL INVOLVEMENT; PROMOTING THEIR HEALTH AND WELLBEING; PROVIDING SERVICES TO SUPPORT THEM AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS; PROVIDING SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS HOLDING MEMBERSHIP OF THE CIO; AND FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
67 Albert Road
FARNBOROUGH
GU14 6SL
- Phone:
- 01252510993
- Email:
- bevanlodge@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window