UK STUDENTS FOR THE EXPLORATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF SPACE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
UK Students for the Exploration and Development of Space (UKSEDS) is the UK's national student space society. We support students and enthusiasts across the country by running space projects, hosting conferences and workshops, and doing outreach to inspire and educate.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
Total income includes £30,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 27 February 2019: CIO registration
- 29 July 2020: Funds received from 1158580 UKSEDS
- UKSEDS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Raniah Ahmed | Chair | 05 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lamyea Ahmed | Trustee | 03 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mohamed Ali | Trustee | 03 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anna Kalapurakkal | Trustee | 03 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Tanjin Huda | Trustee | 03 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Divyanshi Gupta | Trustee | 05 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacob Geer | Trustee | 05 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Courtney | Trustee | 05 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy William Ambrose | Trustee | 06 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Peter Shave MBA FRAeS | Trustee | 07 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matjaz Vidmar | Trustee | 08 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/03/2022 | 30/03/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.43k | £36.06k | £49.60k | £41.90k | £82.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17 | £1.61k | £24.91k | £72.92k | £55.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.90k | £30.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 22 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 22 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 27 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN RELATION TO SPACE AND PLANETARY SCIENCE, ASTRONOMY AND TECHNOLOGY AND THEIR SIGNIFICANCE TO LIFE ON EARTH BY: A) MAKING A FORUM FOR THE COMMUNICATION AND EXCHANGE OF IDEAS BETWEEN STUDENTS, EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS, INDUSTRY AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC. B) INFORMING THE GENERAL PUBLIC ON THE EXPLORATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF SPACE AND ITS IMPORTANCE TO LIFE ON EARTH; 2. TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE UK WITH AN ACTIVE INTEREST IN SPACE AND SPACE RELATED SUBJECTS BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE TO IMPROVE THEIR KNOWLEDGE BASE, SKILLSETS AND HANDS-ON EXPERIENCE LEVELS AS A MEANS OF: A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT AND RAISING AWARENESS OF POSSIBLE CAREER OPPORTUNITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
UKSEDS
27-29 SOUTH LAMBETH ROAD
LONDON
SW8 1SZ
- Phone:
- 020 7735 3160
- Email:
- enquiries@ukseds.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window