Trustees UK STUDENTS FOR THE EXPLORATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF SPACE
Charity number: 1182239

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna Kalapurakkal | Chair | 03 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Suliman Saifullah | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Neha Susan Biju | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anjali Santhakumar | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Divyam Aneja | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Courtney | Trustee | 05 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacob Geer | Trustee | 05 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Raniah Ahmed | Trustee | 05 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Peter Shave MBA FRAeS | Trustee | 07 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matjaz Vidmar | Trustee | 08 March 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.