Trustees THE ARTS SOCIETY OXFORD

Charity number: 1175875
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ann McIlhinney Chair 11 September 2019
None on record
Susan Heather Hine Trustee 14 September 2022
None on record
Raymond John Wright Trustee 24 February 2022
OXFORD ORNITHOLOGICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
David Michael Stern Trustee 15 September 2021
None on record
Ruth Mary Burdett Trustee 15 September 2021
None on record
David Nicholas Barron Trustee 06 May 2021
None on record
Carol Brownson Trustee 17 September 2020
None on record