THE DREW BARKER-WRIGHT CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the charity are:- A To relieve the needs of sufferers of paediatric chordoma, their family and carers, as a result of the same. B The relief of sickness and the preservation of health by the funding of research into paediatric chordoma through the provision of grants and the publication of useful result from such research: and C To advance education of the general public
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 January 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MELANIE BARKER | Chair | 16 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
GAYNOR BARKER | Trustee | 16 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN VAUGHAN WRIGHT | Trustee | 16 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD ASHBURNER DAVID BARKER | Trustee | 16 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.70k | £22.53k | £17.54k | £14.63k | £13.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.44k | £31.65k | £21.30k | £15.72k | £16.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- (A) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUFFERERS OF PAEDIATRIC CHORDOMA, THEIR FAMILY AND CARERS AS A RESULT OF THE SAME; (B) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH BY THE FUNDING OF RESEARCH INTO PAEDIATRIC CHORDOMA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND THE PUBLICATION OF USEFUL RESULTS FROM SUCH RESEARCH; AND (C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN RELATION TO PAEDIATRIC CHORDOMA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 REGENT STREET
TALGARTH
BRECON
LD3 0DB
- Phone:
- 01874712360
- Email:
- info@dbwcharity.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window