THE FORT SLOUGH COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Fort Slough Community Church is a community church based in the town of Slough in England. We believe in God and we use the christian Bible for preaching We depend on contributions from our members for our expenses we do not employ anybody the church has a board made up of men and women to run the church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 11 June 2018: Standard registration
- SCC (Working name)
- SCC THE FORT (Working name)
- SLOUGH COMMUNITY CHURCH (Working name)
- THE FORT (Working name)
- THE FORT SCC (Working name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAMBUDZO MUBARE | Chair | 18 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Saida Mugari | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Sauti | Trustee | 07 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
KANISIO RAMWI | Trustee | 23 September 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/08/2020 | 30/08/2021 | 30/08/2022 | 30/08/2023 | 30/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.46k | £23.36k | £28.26k | £26.64k | £32.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.21k | £24.26k | £35.39k | £22.88k | £20.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 August 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 August 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 August 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 August 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2020 | 29 July 2021 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
‘TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGHOUT ENGLAND AND WALES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PUBLIC WORSHIP AND PRAYER.’
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 EGERTON DRIVE
BASINGSTOKE
RG24 9FG
- Phone:
- 07916142750
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window