NORTH BUCKINGHAM PARISH PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL

Charity number: 1175236
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Church

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £94,080
Total expenditure: £94,163

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 October 2017: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • AKELEY DISTRICT CHURCH COUNCIL (Working name)
  • LECKHAMPSTEAD DISTRICT CHURCH COUNCIL (Working name)
  • LILLINGSTONE DAYRELL DISTRICT CHURCH COUNCIL (Working name)
  • LILLINGSTONE LOVELL DISTRICT CHURCH COUNCIL (Working name)
  • MAIDS MORETON DISTRICT CHURCH COUNCIL (Working name)
  • NORTH BUCKINGHAM PARISH PCC (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHANNAS TALING Chair 01 October 2006
None on record
Nicholas Taylor Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Zoe Jones Trustee 01 October 2020
SHACKS BARN & BUCKINGHAM RDA GROUP
Received: On time
THE MAJOR CHARLES HALL MEMORIAL CHARITY FOR THE POOR
Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days
Anthony White Trustee 01 October 2020
THE MAJOR CHARLES HALL MEMORIAL CHARITY FOR THE POOR
Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days
CATHY PEARCE Trustee 01 January 2016
None on record
JOHN COWLEY Trustee 01 April 2012
None on record
MERLE HARRISON Trustee 01 January 2007
None on record
MARGARET HELEN CULLEY Trustee 01 April 2000
None on record
CHRISTINE MARY HOCKLEY Trustee 01 January 2000
None on record
GEORGIE CHRISTOPHER Trustee 01 October 1987
None on record
BETH KING Trustee 01 January 1987
None on record
John Edward Hockley Trustee 01 January 1987
AKELEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND EDUCATIONAL FUND
Received: On time
POOR'S ALLOTMENT
Received: On time
CYNTHIA COWLEY Trustee 01 January 1987
AKELEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND EDUCATIONAL FUND
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £140.05k £99.07k £97.49k £90.16k £94.08k
Total expenditure £145.76k £91.43k £86.83k £89.99k £94.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 04 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 October 2022 338 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 04 October 2022 338 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Rosemount
Wicken Road
Leckhampstead
BUCKINGHAM
MK18 5NZ
Phone:
07710553154