VIPASSANA TRUST (DHAMMA SUKHAKARI)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objective of Vipassana Trust (Dhamma Sukhakari) is to advance the teachings of the Buddha for the public benefit by organising and running courses of Vipassana meditation as taught by S. N. Goenka, in the tradition of Sayagyi U Ba Khin.The courses are offered completely free of charge and staffed by un-paid volunteers. People from all walks of life attend course.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
250 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 November 2017: CIO registration
- DHAMMA SUKHAKARI TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Aditi Gandhi | Chair | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mina Shreekant Bobdey | Trustee | 03 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kianoosh Pourmirzaei | Trustee | 03 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Phillips | Trustee | 28 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nam Yamaguchi | Trustee | 28 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marc Sethi | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Manoj Kumar Sethumadhavan | Trustee | 20 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
MILIND SHRIKRISHNA BHAGWAT | Trustee | 10 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
GIDEON CHRISTOPHER SEBASTIAN SAWYER | Trustee | 10 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
UMA MAHESWARI SHUNMUGAM | Trustee | 10 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALEX ALISON REVELEY | Trustee | 10 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £445.94k | £293.24k | £179.84k | £318.08k | £399.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £201.81k | £173.79k | £173.02k | £270.64k | £305.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | £28.06k | £4.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE TEACHINGS OF THE BUDDHA FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: • ESTABLISHING, MAINTAINING AND RUNNING THE VIPASSANA MEDITATION CENTRE CALLED DHAMMA SUKHAKARI. • PROVIDING COURSES IN VIPASSANA MEDITATION AS TAUGHT BY S.N. GOENKA IN THE TRADITION OF SAYAGYI U BA KHIN. • DISSEMINATING, PROMOTING, PROVIDING FOR, OR OTHERWISE SUPPORTING MEDITATION AS TAUGHT BY S.N. GOENKA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
VIPASSANA TRUST (DHAMMA SUKHAKARI)
WALNUT TREE MANOR
HAUGHLEY GREEN
STOWMARKET
IP14 3RQ
- Phone:
- 01449 833080
- Email:
- info@sukhakari.dhamma.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window