MAR THOMA CHURCH CANTERBURY, KENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Holy Communion service Sunday School Day Childrens learn Bible stories songs and biblical values Our children have actively participated in various activities like VBS WSS Day Sunday School Talent Day and Sunday School Anniversary. Other activities includes Sevika Sangham Day Education Sunday Family Sunday Youth Sunday and Holy week services and charity works
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 19 January 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Regi Abraham | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
MATHEW VARGHESE | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chacko Peedikakizhakathil | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mody Koshy Manapparampil | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sony Jacob | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lijo Thankachan Jacob | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.50k | £103.06k | £69.16k | £80.53k | £96.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.07k | £19.23k | £54.52k | £58.54k | £75.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 DEC 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TRADITIONS AND FAITH PRACTICES OF MAR THOMA SYRIAN CHURCH OF MALABAR. TO ENHANCE SOCIAL COHESION AND STRONGER RELATIONSHIP BETWEEN FAMILIES , TO BUILD A SOCIETY WITH VALUES AND PRINCIPLES ON THE BASIS OF BIBLE AND THEREBY A STRONGER COMMUNITY. TO PROVIDE SPIRITUAL GUIDANCE AND PASTORAL CARE THROUGH REGULAR WORSHIP SERVICES TO ITS MEMBERS , ENHANCE ECUMENICAL RELATIONSHIPS WITH LOCAL COMMUNITY AND CHURCHES, AND OFFER VOLUNTARY CONTRIBUTIONS TO CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES WITHIN UK AND ABROAD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Hazlitt Drive
MAIDSTONE
Kent
ME16 0EG
- Phone:
- 07745528402
- Email:
- mtccanterbury15@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window